Global Patent Index - EP 1260686 A2

EP 1260686 A2 2002-11-27 - Temperature sensor for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Temperature sensor for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Temperaturerfassungseinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de détection de température pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1260686 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02007544 A

Priority

DE 10124852 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a bearer structure (4), two sensor elements (2,3) accommodated on the structure, a device for feeding at least a sub-flow (V1') of an engine induction flow (V1) to the first sensor element and a device for feeding at least a sub-flow (V2') of an air flow (V2) passing through an engine radiator to the second sensor element. The bearer structure is arranged in a region in which the two air flows run adjacent to each other.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Temperaturerfassungseinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine. Die erfindungsgemäße Temperaturerfassungseinrichtung umfasst eine Trägerstruktur, ein an der Trägerstruktur aufgenommenes erstes Sensorelement, ein ebenfalls an der Trägerstruktur aufgenommenes zweites Sensorelement, eine Motor-Luftführungseinrichtung zur Zuleitung eines Motoransaugluftstromes zu dem ersten Sensorelement und eine Kühler-Luftführungseinrichtung zur Zuleitung eines durch einen Motorkühler hindurchgetretenen Kühler-Luftstromes zu dem zweiten Sensorelement. Hierdurch wird es möglich, durch einen kompakte und vormontierbare Baueinheit die Temperaturen der beiden Luftströme zentral zu erfassen, wobei die gewonnenen Messsignale unter vermindertem Verkabelungsaufwand in ein fahrzeugseitig vorgesehenes Kabelbaumsystem eingekoppelt werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/14; F02B 77/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/16 (2006.01); F01P 5/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/16 (2013.01); F01P 5/02 (2013.01); F01P 2025/08 (2013.01); F01P 2025/13 (2013.01); F01P 2025/50 (2013.01); F02D 41/222 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0414 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260686 A2 20021127; EP 1260686 A3 20041201; EP 1260686 B1 20080813; DE 10124852 A1 20021205; DE 50212624 D1 20080925; US 2002177937 A1 20021128; US 6644850 B2 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150403

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150403

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50212624

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090514

2008-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212624 P 20080925

2008-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071108

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041211

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI