Global Patent Index - EP 1260694 A2

EP 1260694 A2 2002-11-27 - Method and device for increasing the voltage level of a high-dynamic inductive load

Title (en)

Method and device for increasing the voltage level of a high-dynamic inductive load

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erhöhung des Spannungsniveaus an hochdynamischen induktiven Stellgliedern

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour accroître le niveau du voltage d'une charge inductive à grande dynamique

Publication

EP 1260694 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010711 A

Priority

DE 10123519 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using the inductive energy present during the switching off of one or more inductive loads (5-7) to increase the voltage when switching on the remaining electromagnetic loads or, if an increased switch-on voltage is exceeded, supplying electrical actuators (9) in the on-board electrical system via switching elements (20-23). AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a circuit for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zur Ansteuerung elektromagnetischer Verbraucher (5, 6, 7) eines Bordnetzes (1), welches eine Spannungsquelle (2) und ein Steuergerät (3) enthält, das die elektromagnetischen Verbraucher (5, 6, 7) über diesen zugeordnete Schalter (11, 11, 12) ansteuert. Die bei Abschaltung eines oder mehrerer der elektromagnetischen Verbraucher (5, 6, 7) vorhandene induktive Energie wird zur Spannungsanhebung beim Einschalten der übrigen der elektromagnetischen Verbraucher (5, 6, 7) eingesetzt oder bei Überschreiten einer erhöhten Einschaltspannung eines elektrischen Aktuators (9) über Schaltelemente (20, 21, 22, 23; 30, 33, 34) in das Bordnetz (1) eingespeist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; H03K 17/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01); H03K 17/695 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 2041/201 (2013.01); H01F 7/1877 (2013.01); H01F 2007/1822 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260694 A2 20021127; EP 1260694 A3 20050518; EP 1260694 B1 20090916; DE 10123519 A1 20021205; DE 50213843 D1 20091029; ES 2330724 T3 20091215

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120515

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213843

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120514

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110530

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100617

2009-12-15 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2330724 T3

2009-10-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213843 P 20091029

2009-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-02-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-01-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051118

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-05-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI