Global Patent Index - EP 1260697 A2

EP 1260697 A2 2002-11-27 - Turbocharged internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Turbocharged internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Aufgeladene Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne suralimenté

Publication

EP 1260697 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006429 A

Priority

DE 10125551 A

Abstract (en)

The silencer (14) is integrated into a coupling between charging air hose (12) and pressure connection (10) so as to reach into hose and connection. The silencer comprises outer chamber (26) and second outer chamber (30) arranged so chamber (26) engages connection (10) via orifice (8) and chamber (30) engages the hose (12) via orifice (32). The inner pipe (14) comprises a first part as chamber (26) and second part as chamber (30), with parts (16,18) meeting where bent at interface (34) in flanges (38) and here welded together. The silencer is designed for turbocharger incorporation.

The silencer (14) is integrated into a coupling between charging air hose (12) and pressure connection (10) so as to reach into hose and connection. The silencer comprises outer chamber (26) and second outer chamber (30) arranged so chamber (26) engages connection (10) via orifice (8) and chamber (30) engages the hose (12) via orifice (32). The inner pipe (14) comprises a first part as chamber (26) and second part as chamber (30), with parts (16,18) meeting where bent at interface (34) in flanges (38) and here welded together. The silencer is designed for turbocharger incorporation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug, mit einem eine Ladeluft verdichtenden Lader, welcher einen Verdichterdruckstutzen (10) aufweist, einem Ansaugtrakt, einem den Verdichterdruckstutzen (10) des Laders mit dem Ansaugtrakt verbindenden Ladeluftschlauch (12) und einem im Luftstrom der Ladeluft angeordneten Geräuschdämpfer. Hierbei ist der Geräuschdämpfer (14, 20) in eine Kupplung zwischen Ladeluftschlauch (12) und Verdichterdruckstutzen (10) derart integriert, daß der Geräuschdämpfer (14, 20) einerseits in den Verdichterdruckstutzen (10) und andererseits in den Ladeluftschlauch (12) eingreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/12 (2006.01); F02B 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/1255 (2013.01); F02M 35/10144 (2013.01); F02M 35/1283 (2013.01); F02B 29/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260697 A2 20021127; EP 1260697 A3 20031112; EP 1260697 B1 20060329; DE 10125551 A1 20021128; DE 50206182 D1 20060518

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150322

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150322

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50206182

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50206182

- Effective date: 20111008

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060717

2006-07-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206182 P 20060518

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040512

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI