Global Patent Index - EP 1260700 A1

EP 1260700 A1 2002-11-27 - Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de carburant pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1260700 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02008447 A

Priority

DE 10123995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10123995A1] The fuel injection device has a fuel pump (10) for each cylinder of the engine. The first electrically operated control valve (60) controls the first connection between the pump working cavity and the relief cavity. The second one (68) controls the pressure in the control cavity (52) of the injection valve (12), and the third one (74) controls the second connection between the pump working cavity and the relief cavity.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist für für jeden Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine eine Kraftstoffpumpe (10) auf, die einen durch die Brennkraftmaschine in einer Hubbewegung angetriebenen Pumpenkolben (18) aufweist, der einen Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) begrenzt, dem Kraftstoff aus einem Kraftstoffvorratsbehälter (24) zugeführt wird und der mit einem Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) verbunden ist, das ein Einspritzventilglied (28) aufweist, durch das wenigstens eine Einspritzöffnung (32) gesteuert wird und das durch den im Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) erzeugten Druck gegen eine Schließkraft in einer Öffnungsrichtung (29) bewegbar ist. Durch ein erstes elektrisch gesteuertes Steuerventil (60), wird eine Verbindung (59) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit einem Entlastungsraum (24) gesteuert und durch ein zweites elektrisch gesteuertes Steuerventil (68) wird der in einem Steuerdruckraum (52) des Kraftstoffeinspritzventils (12) herrschende Druck gesteuert, durch den das Einspritzventilglied (28) in Schließrichtung beaufschlagt ist. Es ist ein drittes Steuerventil (74) vorgesehen, durch das eine weitere Verbindung (75) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit dem Entlastungsraum (24) gesteuert wird, wobei in dieser Verbindung (75) ein Druckbegrenzungsventil (76) angeordnet ist, das zum Entlastungsraum (24) hin öffnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 45/00; F02M 47/02; F02M 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/02 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0061 (2013.01); F02M 45/02 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01); F02M 59/468 (2013.01); F02M 63/0049 (2013.01); F02M 2200/703 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260700 A1 20021127; EP 1260700 B1 20050202; DE 10123995 A1 20021121; US 2003010846 A1 20030116; US 6540160 B2 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070413

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060413

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-04-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060413

2006-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-04-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202158 P 20050310

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-02-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040213

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI