Global Patent Index - EP 1260702 A2

EP 1260702 A2 2002-11-27 - A fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

A fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de carburant d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1260702 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008632 A

Priority

DE 10123993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10123993A1] The fuel injection device includes a first electrically operated control valve (60) and a second one (68) to control the pressure in a pressure control cavity (52). There is a pressure maintaining valve (62) between the working cavity (22) of the pump and the first control valve, and open to the latter, by which a pressure higher than that in the relief cavity (24) is maintained.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist für jeden Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine eine Kraftstoffpumpe (10) auf, die mit einem Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) verbunden ist, das ein Einspritzventilglied (28) aufweist, durch das wenigstens eine Einspritzöffnung (32) gesteurt wird und das durch den im Pumpenarbeitsraum (22) erzeugten Druck gegen eine Schließkraft in einer Öffnungsrichtung (29) bewegbar ist. Durch ein erstes elektrisch gesteuertes Steuerventil (60), wird eine Verbindung (59) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) mit einem Entlastungsraum (24) gesteuert und durch ein zweites elektrisch gesteuertes Steuerventil (68) wird der in einem Steuerdruckraum (52) des Kraftstoffeinspritzventils (12) herrschende Druck gesteuert. In der durch das erste Steuerventil (60) gesteuerten Verbindung (59) des Pumpenarbeitsraums (22) ist ein Druckhalteventil (62) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 45/00; F02M 45/06; F02M 45/12; F02M 59/36; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0045 (2013.01); F02M 45/00 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0957261 A2 19991117 - LUCAS IND PLC [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260702 A2 20021127; EP 1260702 A3 20040317; EP 1260702 B1 20051102; DE 10123993 A1 20021121; DE 50204742 D1 20051208; US 2003006296 A1 20030109; US 6637670 B2 20031028

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50204742

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090417

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090417

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051102

2006-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-12-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061222

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060202

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204742 P 20051208

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051102

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041023

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 A

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/36 B

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/00 B

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/46 B

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/12 B

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 45/06 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI