Global Patent Index - EP 1260703 A2

EP 1260703 A2 2002-11-27 - Fuel injection valve

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de carburant

Publication

EP 1260703 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010912 A

Priority

DE 10124745 A

Abstract (en)

The injection ports (7) issue from raised parts (36) surmounting the valve seat (5) and through fuel channels (39) in the parts (36). The raised parts (36) thus enter the space (38) between valve seat (5) and seal (4). The fuel channels (39) widen out towards the ports (7), first in a barrel shape going over into a trumpet shape.

Abstract (de)

Ein Brennstoffeinspritzventil (1) für Brennstoffeinspritzanlagen von Brennkraftmaschinen umfaßt eine Magnetspule (10), eine mit der Magnetspule (10) in Wirkverbindung stehende und in einer Schließrichtung von einer Rückstellfeder (23) beaufschlagte Ventilnadel (3) zur Betätigung eines Ventilschließkörpers (4), der zusammen mit einer an einem Ventilsitzkörper (5) ausgebildeten Ventilsitzfläche (6) einen Dichtsitz bildet, und zumindest eine Abspritzöffnung (7), die in dem Ventilsitzkörper (5) ausgebildet ist. Die Abspritzöffnungen (7) münden aus Erhebungen (36) aus, welche eine innere Stirnseite (37) des Ventilsitzkörpers (5) überragen, wobei der Brennstoff durch Strömungskanäle (39) in den Erhebungen (36) geleitet wird. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/205 (2013.01); F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01); F02M 61/1806 (2013.01); F02M 61/1833 (2013.01); F02M 61/188 (2013.01); F02M 61/165 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19804463 A1 19990812 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260703 A2 20021127; EP 1260703 A3 20040128; EP 1260703 B1 20070704; DE 10124745 A1 20030327; DE 50210406 D1 20070816

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210406

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100516

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100516

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100516

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080407

2007-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070919

2007-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210406 P 20070816

2007-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-07-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI