Global Patent Index - EP 1260706 A2

EP 1260706 A2 2002-11-27 - Device for fixing a fuel injector in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Device for fixing a fuel injector in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Befestigungseinrichtung eines Injektors einer Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung an einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un injecteur à combustible dans un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1260706 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02008631 A

Priority

DE 10125440 A

Abstract (en)

The fixing for a fuel injection valve in a motor vehicle internal combustion engine has an annular groove (24) formed in the injector (12) to receive sprung circlip (26) which extends from the surface of the injector housing. A retaining ring (30) rests on the circlip and is engaged by a yoke (40) to hold the injector in its seating.

Abstract (de)

Am Injektor (12) ist zumindest mittelbar eine quer zu dessen Längsachse (13) verlaufende Auflagefläche (36) angeordnet, an der eine Spannpratze (40) angreift, die an der Brennkraftmaschine (11) befestigbar ist, wobei der Injektor (12) in eine Bohrung (10) der Brennkraftmaschine (11) eingesetzt ist und durch die Spannpratze (40) in Richtung seiner Längsachse (13) gegen einen Anschlag (18) an der Brennkraftmaschine (11) gehalten wird. Der Injektor (12) weist in seinem Außenmantel eine Ringnut (24) auf, in der ein elastisch aufweitbarer Stützring (26) angeordnet ist, der in radialer Richtung bezüglich der Längsachse (13) des Injektors (12) über dessen Außenmantel hinausragt. Von dessen aus der Bohrung (10) ragendem Ende her ist auf den Injektor (12) ein Auflagering (30) aufgeschoben, der über einen Teil (32) seines Umfangs offen ist, der auf dem Injektor (12) um dessen Längsachse (13) verdrehbar ist, der sich am Stützring (26) in Richtung der Längsachse (13) des Injektors (12) abstützt und an dem die Auflagefläche (36) angeordnet ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0957263 A1 19991117 - PERKINS ENGINES CO LTD [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260706 A2 20021127; EP 1260706 A3 20080220; EP 1260706 B1 20090325; DE 10125440 A1 20021128; DE 50213375 D1 20090507

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120417

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120418

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213375

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090625

2010-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091229

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090625

2009-05-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-05-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213375 P 20090507

2009-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2009-03-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2008-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080820

2008-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI