Global Patent Index - EP 1260714 A1

EP 1260714 A1 2002-11-27 - Pump unit with drive motor and submersible pump

Title (en)

Pump unit with drive motor and submersible pump

Title (de)

Motorpumpemaggregat mit elektrischem Antriebsmotor und einntauchbaren Kreiselpumpe

Title (fr)

Unité moteur/pompe avec moteur d'entraînement et pompe immersible

Publication

EP 1260714 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112676 A

Priority

EP 01112676 A

Abstract (en)

The motor (2) has a rotatably mounted drive shaft with a rotor, a stator (7) enclosing the rotor and a motor housing that carries heat away with a front end wall for connection to the pump. An inner housing (9) that carries the stator consists of thermally conducting material and is in thermally conducting contact with the front end wall that is subjected to the medium on its pump side. A casing (11) around the inner housing forms a space (12) for motor electrics.

Abstract (de)

Der Antriebsmotor umfasst eine drehbar gelagerte Antriebswelle (5) mit einem darauf drehfest angeordneten Rotor (6), einen den Rotor (6) umgebenden Stator (7) und ein Wärme abführendes Motorgehäuse mit einer mit der Kreiselpumpe verbindbaren vorderen Endwand (8). Das Motorgehäuse weist ein Innengehäuse (9), das den Stator (7) trägt, aus wärmeleitendem Material besteht und mit der vorderen Endwand (8), die auf ihrer Pumpenseite mit Fördermedium der Kreiselpumpe beaufschlagbar ist, in wärmeleitendem Kontakt steht, und einen das Innengehäuse (9) mit radialem Abstand umgebenden Mantel (11) zur Ausbildung eines gegenüber der äußeren Motorumgebung abgedichteten Ringraumes (12) zwischen dem Innengehäuse (9) und diesem Mantel (11) auf, wobei in dem Ringraum (12) elektrische Mittel (23) zum Betrieb des Antriebsmotors (2) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/58; F04D 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/08 (2006.01); F04D 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/0686 (2013.01); F04D 13/086 (2013.01); F04D 29/588 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0599204 A1 19940601 - GRUNDFOS AS [DK]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260714 A1 20021127; EP 1260714 B1 20061129; DE 50111547 D1 20070111

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111547 P 20070111

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PUMP UNIT WITH DRIVE MOTOR AND SUBMERSIBLE PUMP

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI