Global Patent Index - EP 1260715 A1

EP 1260715 A1 2002-11-27 - Positioning unit actuated by pressurised fluid

Title (en)

Positioning unit actuated by pressurised fluid

Title (de)

Druckmittelbetätigbare Stelleranordnung

Title (fr)

Unité de positionnement activée par fluide sous pression

Publication

EP 1260715 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010505 A

Priority

DE 10123947 A

Abstract (en)

The actuator device has a pressurized medium delivery device (20) that takes up a volume of medium during a first partial stroke of a working piston (2) in a second pressurized medium chamber (D2) and delivers a volume of the medium during a second partial stroke of the piston, whereby the delivered or taken up quantities are dependent on the amplitudes of each partial stroke. Independent claims are also included for the following: a unit containing an inventive device for fitting in a rotary system of a helicopter's main rotor and a helicopter rotor blade controller.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine druckmittelbetätigbare Stelleranordnung mit einem in einem Stellerzylinder (4) geführten Arbeitskolben (2), der beidseitig mit Druck beaufschlagt ist. Um ein Auswandern des Arbeitskolbens (2) aus seiner Neutralstellung (x = 0) in Folge von Leckagen zu verhindern, wird eine Druckmittelfördereinrichtung (20) vorgeschlagen, die über eine Periode einer harmonischen Bewegung des Arbeitskolbens (2) der Seite des Arbeitskolbens (2), zu der er hin ausgewandert ist, ein Ausgleichsvolumen zuführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/126 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260715 A1 20021127; EP 1260715 B1 20031105; DE 10123947 A1 20021205; US 2003007868 A1 20030109

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2007-05-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070503

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-05-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060510

2004-11-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200091 P 20031211

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI