Global Patent Index - EP 1260757 A1

EP 1260757 A1 2002-11-27 - Lighting device producing asymmetrical light beam and equipped with non-reflective cover

Title (en)

Lighting device producing asymmetrical light beam and equipped with non-reflective cover

Title (de)

Eine mit einer reflexvermindernden Scheibe ausgerüstete Leuchte, die ein asymetrisches Lichtbündel erzeugt

Title (fr)

Luminaire à faisceau d'éclairage asymétrique équipé d'une glace anti-reflet

Publication

EP 1260757 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02077014 A

Priority

FR 0106749 A

Abstract (en)

The light fitting (10) has a parabolic reflector (18) which is aligned asymmetrically with the protective glass (14) to give a beam directed in the forward sense and suitable for illuminating sports grounds or motorway tunnels. Anti-reflective coatings (42,44) are applied to both sides of the protective glass to reduce the amount of light projected backwards by double reflection

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose un luminaire (10) à faisceau d'éclairage asymétrique, orienté globalement vers la surface à éclairer et vers l'avant du luminaire (10) suivant une direction d'éclairage principale, comportant un réflecteur (18), de profil globalement parabolique et asymétrique, qui délimite une ouverture (32), une source lumineuse (12) agencée sensiblement au foyer de la parabole, et une glace de protection (14) sensiblement plane qui ferme le réflecteur (18), caractérisé en ce qu'au moins une face de la glace de protection (14) comporte un revêtement anti-réfléchissant (42, 44). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 3/04; F21V 7/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 3/04 (2006.01); F21V 7/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/08 (2013.01); F21V 3/04 (2013.01); F21V 7/09 (2013.01); F21W 2131/101 (2013.01); F21W 2131/103 (2013.01); F21W 2131/105 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9817944 A1 19980430 - WALTER WADEY & CO PTY LTD [AU], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260757 A1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050628

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041217

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI