Global Patent Index - EP 1260758 A1

EP 1260758 A1 2002-11-27 - Headlight for motor vehicle

Title (en)

Headlight for motor vehicle

Title (de)

Kfz-Scheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Projecteur d'éclairage de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1260758 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291244 A

Priority

FR 0107009 A

Abstract (en)

The headlamp (10) has a light source (12) at the focal point of a mirror (14) which may be elliptical and a lens (16) which is located to produce a parallel beam. Light (32) emanating from a part of the source not exactly at the mirror focal point would remain dispersed after passing through the lens but may be usefully redirected (33) by an auxiliary plane mirror (50) placed between main mirror and lens

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose un projecteur d'éclairage (10) de véhicule automobile du type qui comporte une source lumineuse (12) montée dans un miroir (14) pour fournir un flux de lumière qui traverse une lentille optique (16) et qui forme un faisceau d'éclairage (28) d'une zone de la route selon une première répartition de l'intensité lumineuse, caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte un organe réflecteur (50) qui est agencé entre le miroir (14) et la lentille (16) et qui est susceptible de dévier une partie du flux de lumière de façon à concentrer l'intensité lumineuse de la partie déviée du flux vers une portion prédéterminée de la zone éclairée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/00; F21V 5/00; F21V 14/04; F21V 14/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/04 (2006.01); F21V 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/675 (2018.01); F21S 41/28 (2018.01); F21S 41/365 (2018.01); F21S 41/635 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260758 A1 20021127; FR 2825138 A1 20021129; FR 2825138 B1 20040109

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-10-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021227

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI