Global Patent Index - EP 1260759 A1

EP 1260759 A1 2002-11-27 - Signalling light for vehicle with a painted reflective surface

Title (en)

Signalling light for vehicle with a painted reflective surface

Title (de)

Fahrzeugsignalleuchte mit einer angestrichenen, reflektierenden Oberfläche

Title (fr)

Feu de signalisation pour véhicule à face réfléchissante peinte

Publication

EP 1260759 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291243 A

Priority

FR 0107010 A

Abstract (en)

The composite indicating light includes a fog function which has a dedicated light source in relation to a parabolic reflecting zone (122). The reflecting zone has a reflecting surface (19) formed by a coating of aluminum particle paint (18) and vertical grooves forming zones with circular or parabolic sections such that the deviation of a point light source is between 11 and 16 degrees.

Abstract (fr)

Le feu de signalisation pour véhicule, comprend au moins une source de lumière et une zone de réflecteur (122) présentant une face réfléchissante (19) en regard de la source de lumière. Le feu est agencé pour assurer une fonction « brouillard » au moyen de la face et de la source, la face réfléchissante étant peinte, la face réfléchissante (122 ; 222 ; 322) ayant une forme parabolique au moins dans des sections verticales, horizontales ou axiales par référence à un axe de la face. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 13/04; F21V 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 43/40 (2018.01); F21S 43/26 (2018.01); F21S 43/30 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260759 A1 20021127; FR 2825139 A1 20021129; FR 2825139 B1 20040109

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021227

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI