Global Patent Index - EP 1260761 A2

EP 1260761 A2 2002-11-27 - Projection module for vehicle headlamp

Title (en)

Projection module for vehicle headlamp

Title (de)

Projektionsmodul für einen Fahrzeugscheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Module de projection pour projecteur de véhicule

Publication

EP 1260761 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010544 A

Priority

DE 10125463 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a reflector (2), a light source (3), a lens (7) before the reflector, a fixed main beam stop (4) between source and lens, a movable stop (5) pivotable into the beam for an asymmetrical dipped beam and an auxiliary stop (6) for a symmetrical dipped beam arranged in front of the pivotable stop towards the lens on a lever (29) on a lateral plate (30) on the main beam stop and pivotable about an approximately horizontal transverse axis.

Abstract (de)

Projektionsmodul (1) für einen Fahrzeugscheinwerfer mit einem Reflektor (2), mit einer dem Reflektor (2) zugeordneten Lichtquelle (3), mit einer dem Reflektor (2) in Abstrahlrichtung vorgelagerten Linse (7), mit einer zwischen der Lichtquelle (3) und der Linse (7) angeordneten feststehenden Fernlichtblende (4), einer der Fernlichtblende (4) zur Linse (7) hin vorgelagerten zur Erzeugung von asymmetrischen Abblendlicht in den Strahlengang einschwenkbaren Schaltblende (5) und einer der Fernlichtblende (4) vorgelagerten Zusatzblende (6) zur Erzeugung von symmetrischen Abblendlicht, wobei die Zusatzblende (6) zur Linse (7) hin der Schaltblende (5) vorgelagert ist und wobei die Zusatzblende (6) über einen angeformten Hebel (29) an einer seitlichen Lasche (30) der Fernlichtblende (4) gelagert und um eine quer zur optischen Achse (10) des Reflektors (2) etwa horizontal verlaufende Schwenkachse (14) schwenkbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 14/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/16 (2006.01); F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/689 (2018.01); F21S 41/43 (2018.01); F21S 41/62 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19858225 A1 20000621 - HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260761 A2 20021127; EP 1260761 A3 20040317; EP 1260761 B1 20060712; DE 10125463 A1 20021128; DE 50207470 D1 20060824; ES 2267896 T3 20070316

INPADOC legal status


2017-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HELLA GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO., 59557 LIPPSTADT, DE

- Document: DE 50207470

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100511

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100510

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090605

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2267896 T3

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207470 P 20060824

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-07-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2004-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI