Global Patent Index - EP 1260762 A2

EP 1260762 A2 2002-11-27 - Projection module for vehicle headlamp

Title (en)

Projection module for vehicle headlamp

Title (de)

Projektionsmodul für einen Fahrzeugscheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Module de projection pour projecteur de véhicule

Publication

EP 1260762 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010545 A

Priority

DE 10125462 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a reflector (2), a light source (3), a lens (6), a fixed main beam stop (4) between source and lens and a movable stop (5) pivotable into the beam for a dipped beam that is joined to the main beam stop by a bearing (12). The bearing consists of a plastic bearing element molded onto the metal main beam stop and a plastic bearing sleeve molded onto the metal movable stop and designed to fit onto the bearing element.

Abstract (de)

Projektionsmodul (1) für einen Fahrzeugscheinwerfer mit einem Reflektor (2), mit einer dem Reflektor (2) zugeordneten Lichtquelle (3), mit einer dem Reflektor (2) in Abstrahlrichtung vorgelagerten Linse (6), mit einer zwischen der Lichtquelle (3) und der Linse (6) angeordneten feststehenden Fernlichtblende (4) und einer der Fernlichtblende (4) zur Linse (6) hin vorgelagerten quer zur Längsachse (8) in den Strahlengang einschwenkbaren Schaltblende (5) für Abblendlicht, die über eine Lagerung (12) mit der Fernlichtblende (4) verbunden ist, wobei die Lagerung (12) aus einem hülsenförmigen Lagerelement (13) aus Kunststoff, das an die aus Metall ausgebildete Fernlichtblende (4) angespritzt ist sowie aus einer Lagerhülse (14) aus Kunststoff besteht, die an die aus Metall ausgebildete Schaltblende (5) angespritzt und auf das hülsenförmige Lagerelement (13) aufsteckbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 14/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/16 (2006.01); F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 41/686 (2018.01); F21S 41/43 (2018.01); F21S 41/62 (2018.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260762 A2 20021127; EP 1260762 A3 20040317; EP 1260762 B1 20081126; AT 415594 T 20081215; DE 10125462 A1 20021128; DE 50213040 D1 20090108

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HELLA GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO., 59557 LIPPSTADT, DE

- Document: DE 50213040

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170413

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-11-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090308

2009-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213040 P 20090108

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2004-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI