Global Patent Index - EP 1260763 A1

EP 1260763 A1 2002-11-27 - Assembly for mounting a self-supporting spotlight on a tensioned ceiling

Title (en)

Assembly for mounting a self-supporting spotlight on a tensioned ceiling

Title (de)

Anordung zur Befestigung eines selbsttragenden Spots an einer gespannten Decke

Title (fr)

Ensemble de montage d'un spot auto-portant sur un plafond tendu

Publication

EP 1260763 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02370020 A

Priority

FR 0106744 A

Abstract (en)

A circular reinforcing washer with indents (9) is glued to the suspended ceiling (4) and the ceiling is then cut away around inner washer and indent surface to allow entry by a spotlight collar. The spotlight collar has lugs (8) which slide through the washer indents and grip the ceiling after the collar has been pressed in and twisted. Collar shoulders (3) grip the reinforcing washer to complete the fixing and the bulb clicks (10) into the collar

Abstract (fr)

L'ensemble de montage d'un spot auto-portant sur un plafond tendu comprend une rondelle de renfort collée sur la membrane (4) formant le plafond et un spot comprenant au moins une ampoule et une collerette de spot solidarisable à la rondelle de renfort. Selon l'invention , la collerette de spot comprend des premiers moyens de solidarisation (8) et la rondelle de renfort comprend des seconds moyens de solidarisation (9), lesdits premiers (8) et seconds moyens (9) étant aptes à coopérer , de manière réversible, lors du pivotement angulaire de la collerette par rapport à la rondelle pour leur verrouillage et leur déverrouillage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/04; F21S 8/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/02 (2006.01); F21V 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/026 (2013.01); F21S 8/02 (2013.01); F21V 21/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260763 A1 20021127; EP 1260763 B1 20060419; AT 323866 T 20060515; AU 2002304488 B2 20080619; CA 2415205 A1 20021128; CA 2415205 C 20080506; DE 60210703 D1 20060524; DE 60210703 T2 20070510; DK 1260763 T3 20060814; EA 005061 B1 20041028; EA 200300051 A1 20031225; ES 2262773 T3 20061201; FR 2825137 A1 20021129; FR 2825137 B1 20040123; PT 1260763 E 20060831; US 2004011936 A1 20040122; US 7070306 B2 20060704; WO 02095286 A1 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180426

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-06-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171206

2018-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170521

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170607

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20160505

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070122

2006-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2262773 T3

2006-09-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060402501

2006-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-08-14 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-08-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SUSI PRYDE-HAENI BSC

2006-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60210703 P 20060524

2006-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-04-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI