Global Patent Index - EP 1260770 A1

EP 1260770 A1 2002-11-27 - Household appliance with cooking chamber

Title (en)

Household appliance with cooking chamber

Title (de)

Haushaltsgerät mit einem Garraum

Title (fr)

Appareil ménager avec chambre de cuisson

Publication

EP 1260770 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010692 A

Priority

DE 10125247 A

Abstract (en)

The domestic cooker has a cooking chamber (2) with an opening defined by a frame (9). The chamber has side frames (7) to support cooking trays at different heights. The different heights (8.1-8.4) are demarked separately (6.1-6.4). The cooker has sensors to determine the optimum cooking height for different weights and types of foodstuffs so that cooking can be controlled dependent on the food stuff and its position in the chamber.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Haushaltgerät mit einem Garraum (2), dessen Garraumöffnung von einem Garraumrahmen (9) umgeben ist, wobei im Garraum (2) Aufnahmevorrichtungen (7) für Gargutträger angeordnet sind, in denen die Gargutträger auf Ebenen (8.1 - 8.4) in unterschiedlichen Höhen positionierbar sind, mit einer Bedienblende (3), welche eine Eingabeeinrichtung (4) aufweist, mit einer elektronischen Steuereinrichtung zur Aufnahme und Auswertung von Daten zu Art und/oder Gewicht des Gargutes, welche durch die Eingabeeinrichtung (4) eingebbar oder direkt erfassbar sind. Um ein klar und übersichtlich gestaltetes Haushaltgerät mit einem Garraum (2) zu offenbaren, das bedienerfreundliche Garempfehlungen signalisiert, wird vorgeschlagen, dass jeder Ebene (8.1 - 8.4) mindestens eine optische Markierung (6.1 - 6.4) im Garraum (2) und/oder am Garraumrahmen (9) zugeordnet wird, wobei die optische Markierung (6.1 - 6.4) durch die Steuereinrichtung in Abhängigkeit der Art und/oder des Gewichtes des Gargutes angesteuert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/16; F24C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01); F24C 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/16 (2013.01); F24C 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260770 A1 20021127; DE 10125247 C1 20021212

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIELE & CIE. KG

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI