Global Patent Index - EP 1260776 A1

EP 1260776 A1 2002-11-27 - A heat exchanger for an air conditioning system

Title (en)

A heat exchanger for an air conditioning system

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher für Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur pour système de climatisation

Publication

EP 1260776 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01112491 A

Priority

EP 01112491 A

Abstract (en)

A heat exchanger (12) for use in a refrigeration system of a vehicle air conditioning system has a first refrigerant pathway (20) through which refrigerant can flow from a gas cooler (11) of the refrigeration system to an expansion valve (13) of the system, and a second refrigerant pathway (21) through which the refrigerant can flow from an evaporator (14) or accumulator 16 of the system to the compressor (10). The two pathways (20, 21) are arranged so that a thermal flow can occur between the refrigerant flowing in them, typically from the relatively warm refrigerant discharged from the condenser (11) to the colder refrigerant discharged from the evaporator (14) or accumulator 16. In order that the thermal flow can be regulated a bypass (22, 23) is provided through which at least a portion of the refrigerant can flow instead of flowing through the pathway or pathways (20, 21) provided with the bypass and a control valve (V1, V2, V3, V4, V5, V6, Z1, Z2, Z3, Z4) is provided to control the flow of refrigerant through the bypass (22, 23). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 40/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 40/00 (2006.01); F25B 9/00 (2006.01); F25B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 40/00 (2013.01); F25B 9/008 (2013.01); F25B 41/04 (2013.01); F25B 2309/061 (2013.01); F25B 2400/04 (2013.01); F25B 2400/054 (2013.01); F25B 2600/2501 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260776 A1 20021127; EP 1260776 B1 20061213; DE 60125146 D1 20070125; DE 60125146 T2 20070412

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60125146 P 20070125

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040517

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI