Global Patent Index - EP 1260802 A1

EP 1260802 A1 2002-11-27 - Wide-band spectrometer with objective comprising an aspherical corrector mirror

Title (en)

Wide-band spectrometer with objective comprising an aspherical corrector mirror

Title (de)

Breitband-Spektrometer mit einem einen asphärischen Korrekturspiegel aufweisenden Objektiv

Title (fr)

Spectromètre à large bande avec un objectif comprenant un miroir asphérique de correction

Publication

EP 1260802 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830338 A

Priority

EP 01830338 A

Abstract (en)

The spectrometer comprises at least a first optical path for a beam of electromagnetic radiation, along which the following are set: a beam-entry slit (1) for an incoming beam; a collimator (5) comprising a convergent spherical mirror for collimation of the incoming beam; a first dispersor (9) for dispersion of the beam into its chromatic components; a first focusing system (19); and a first detector (21) which receives the beam dispersed and focused by said first focusing system. Set along the first optical path there is set at least one first aspherical corrector element (7; 17) comprising an aspherical mirror for correction of spherical aberration. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01J 3/28; G01J 3/02; G01J 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01J 3/02 (2006.01); G01J 3/14 (2006.01); G01J 3/28 (2006.01); G01J 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01J 3/36 (2013.01); G01J 3/02 (2013.01); G01J 3/0208 (2013.01); G01J 3/14 (2013.01); G01J 3/2823 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260802 A1 20021127; EP 1260802 B1 20081029; CA 2387649 A1 20021125; DE 60136336 D1 20081211; US 2002176077 A1 20021128; US 2005128477 A1 20050616; US 6917425 B2 20050712; US 7009702 B2 20060307

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090730

2008-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136336 P 20081211

2008-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040329

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GALILEO AVIONICA S.P.A.

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020323

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI