Global Patent Index - EP 1260856 A1

EP 1260856 A1 2002-11-27 - Film material exhibiting a "colder" blue-black image tone and suitable developability

Title (en)

Film material exhibiting a "colder" blue-black image tone and suitable developability

Title (de)

Filmmaterial, das einen "kälteren" blauschwarzen Bildton und geeignete Entwickelbarkeit aufweist

Title (fr)

Pellicule photographique ayant un ton d'image noir-bleuâtre "plus froid" et une capacité de développement appropriée

Publication

EP 1260856 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01000179 A

Priority

EP 01000179 A

Abstract (en)

A light-sensitive silver halide film material has been provided, comprising at least one light-sensitive silver halide emulsion layer overcoated with a protective antistress layer, said emulsion layer(s) having ä111ü tabular grains or crystals in an amount covering at least 50 % of the total projective grain surface of all grains, characterized in that at least one of said protective layer or said emulsion layer(s) comprises a mercapto thiadiazole or a mercapto oxadiazole compound according to the general formula (I) or a mercapto triazole compound according to the formula (II), presented in the claims and in the detailed description.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/76; G03C 1/005; G03C 5/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/76 (2006.01); G03C 5/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/7614 (2013.01); G03C 5/17 (2013.01); G03C 2001/03535 (2013.01); G03C 2001/03558 (2013.01); G03C 2001/7635 (2013.01); G03C 2200/03 (2013.01); G03C 2200/33 (2013.01); G03C 2200/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260856 A1 20021127; EP 1260856 B1 20041117; DE 60107211 D1 20041223

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120522

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120522

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-03-07 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-01-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-02-18 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050218

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107211 P 20041223

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041117

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI