Global Patent Index - EP 1260895 A2

EP 1260895 A2 2002-11-27 - Method and device for cross-production stage data linking

Title (en)

Method and device for cross-production stage data linking

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur produktionsstufenübergreifenden Verknüpfung von Daten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la liaison des données entre des étapes de production

Publication

EP 1260895 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009423 A

Priority

AT 7442001 A

Abstract (en)

The method is for production stage overlapping production of printed web material in which the production occurs in one or more successively controlled production stages. Data from one production monitoring stage is used for two or more further stages. The data can be collected over the production process, such as through measurement or inspection, stored and then output. Claims include a machine for production stage connection of data using the method

Abstract (de)

In Produktionsanlagen die aus mehreren Produktionsstufen bestehen gehen Lagebezüge von in den einzelnen Stufen erfassten Daten verloren und stehen dadurch nachfolgenden Stufen nicht zur Verfügung. Es ist also nicht möglich erfasste Daten produktionsstufenübergreifend mit einander zur verknüpfen bzw. in Beziehung zu setzen. Deshalb ist es oft notwendig einen hohen Aufwand für Prozessüberwachung, Qualitätsnachweise, Problemanalysen, Recherchen (lokal an einer Anlage und produktionsstufenübergreifend) und Nachweisführung bei Kundenaudits zu betreiben. Die vorliegende Erfindung offenbart nun eine Möglichkeit wie mittels einer produktionsstufenübergreifende Projektion über zwei oder mehrere Produktionsstufen hinweg Daten miteinander verknüpft werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05B 23/02; B21B 37/00; G05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 38/00 (2006.01); B21B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 38/00 (2013.01); B21B 37/00 (2013.01); B21B 2015/0014 (2013.01); B21B 2015/0057 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260895 A2 20021127; EP 1260895 A3 20031126; EP 1260895 B1 20100602; AT 413609 B 20060415; AT 470180 T 20100615; AT A7442001 A 20050815; DE 50214462 D1 20100715

INPADOC legal status


2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120309

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-03-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 470180 T

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-11-29 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 50214462

- Effective date: 20121129

2012-10-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-10-10 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-02-01 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50214462

2012-02-01 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50214462

2011-11-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2011-05-19 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 50214462

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-04-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS SIEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20110302

2010-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214462 P 20100715

2010-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB

2010-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070514

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB

2004-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 05B 23/02 A

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 05B 15/02 B

2003-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21B 37/00 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI