Global Patent Index - EP 1260937 A2

EP 1260937 A2 2002-11-27 - Touch panel device

Title (en)

Touch panel device

Title (de)

Berührungsempfindliche Tafel

Title (fr)

Ecran tactile

Publication

EP 1260937 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01308150 A

Priority

JP 2001145481 A

Abstract (en)

A surface acoustic wave is excited from an excitation element (2,32) disposed on a substrate (1,31), the surface acoustic wave propagated on the substrate is received by a receiving element (3,33) positioned on the substrate so as to face the excitation element, and the position of an object touching the substrate is detected based on the reception result. The wave number of a burst wave applied to excite the excitation element (2,32) is made equal to the number of the comb-like electrode fingers of an inter digital transducer of the excitation element, thereby achieving highly accurate detection and high time resolution. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 11/14; G06F 3/033

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/043 (2006.01); G06F 3/033 (2006.01); G06F 3/041 (2006.01); H03K 17/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0436 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260937 A2 20021127; EP 1260937 A3 20031001; EP 1260937 B1 20050216; DE 60108945 D1 20050324; DE 60108945 T2 20051229; JP 2002342032 A 20021129; JP 3862516 B2 20061227; US 2002171635 A1 20021121; US 6750853 B2 20040615

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-25 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60108945

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06K0011140000

- IPC: G06F0003043000

- Effective date: 20150520

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60108945

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140925

2015-05-20 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60108945

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06K0011140000

- IPC: G06F0003043000

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60108945

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130925

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60108945 P 20050324

2005-03-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06K 11/14 A

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 3/033 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI