Global Patent Index - EP 1260939 A2

EP 1260939 A2 2002-11-27 - Data processing method

Title (en)

Data processing method

Title (de)

Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de données

Publication

EP 1260939 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02006421 A

Priority

JP 2001080226 A

Abstract (en)

A program executing machine generates display image data including data of at least first and second image areas, and changes a display parameter of the second image area in accordance with a characteristic parameter detected in the first image area. The characteristic parameter is, e.g., the mean brightness value of a predetermined area in a dynamic image within the first image area. The brightness of the entire or part of the second image area is changed in accordance with the mean brightness value of the predetermined area. After detecting the mean brightness value of the predetermined area as the characteristic parameter, the program executing machine changes the brightness of a predetermined area within the second image area. A video game with higher reality and higher entertainment is thus realized.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/00 (2006.01); A63F 13/10 (2006.01); G06T 11/60 (2006.01); G09G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/52 (2013.01); A63F 13/10 (2013.01); G09G 5/10 (2013.01); A63F 2300/66 (2013.01); A63F 2300/8017 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0626 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0686 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2002135596 A1 20020926; US 7145569 B2 20061205; EP 1260939 A2 20021127; EP 1260939 A3 20060809; JP 2002273030 A 20020924; JP 3987296 B2 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-10-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070210

2007-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI