Global Patent Index - EP 1260965 A2

EP 1260965 A2 2002-11-27 - Method for fabricating an ultrasonic sensor and ultrasonic sensor

Title (en)

Method for fabricating an ultrasonic sensor and ultrasonic sensor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Ultraschallsensors sowie Ultraschallsensor

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un capteur à ultrasons ainsi qu'un capteur à ultrasons

Publication

EP 1260965 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003246 A

Priority

DE 10125272 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves introducing a decoupling medium (7) in a deformable state between a membrane (5) and the housing (3) of the sensor. The decoupling medium can be poured between the membrane and housing. The decoupling medium can be injection molded between the membrane and housing. A piezo-ceramic is arranged on the membrane. AN Independent claim is also included for an ultrasonic sensor.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Ultraschallsensors sowie auch einen Ultraschallsensor mit einem Gehäuse, einer Membrane und einem zwischen dem Gehäuse und der Membrane angeordneten Entkopplungsmedium. Die Erfindung kennzeichnet sich dadurch, dass das Entkopplungsmedium in einem verformbaren Zustand zwischen die Membrane und das Gehäuse gegeben wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/122 (2006.01); G10K 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/18 (2013.01); G10K 9/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260965 A2 20021127; EP 1260965 A3 20080730; DE 10125272 A1 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-12-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080814

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI