Global Patent Index - EP 1260996 A1

EP 1260996 A1 2002-11-27 - Electromagnetic actuator

Title (en)

Electromagnetic actuator

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer Antrieb

Title (fr)

Actionneur électromagnétique

Publication

EP 1260996 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291270 A

Priority

FR 0106795 A

Abstract (en)

The electromagnetic driver has a coil (5) with a hub (6) and a driver (20,21) and a moving palette (12) pushing against active faces (8,9). The hub has an active face section (10) with a facing edge having a low magnetic gap and a second facing edge (12) having a high magnetic value gap.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un actionneur électromagnétique comprenant au moins une bobine (5) associée à un noyau (6), et un moyen d'actionnement (20,21) associé à une palette (12) montée mobile en rotation autour d'un axe de pivotement (14) entre deux positions extrêmes dans chacune desquelles une face (15,16) de la palette (12) s'étend contre une face active (8,9) du noyau (6), le noyau (6) comportant au moins une partie de paroi active additionnelle (10) en regard d'un bord (11) d'une portion d'extrémité de la palette (12) et présentant avec ce bord (11) un entrefer faible pour au moins une position de la palette (12) dans laquelle une face de la portion d'extrémité de la palette (12) présente un grand entrefer avec une portion de la face active correspondante du noyau (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); H01F 7/14 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0403 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0409 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0436 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260996 A1 20021127; FR 2825186 A1 20021129; FR 2825186 B1 20030905

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090116

2006-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SYSTEMES DE CONTROLE MOTEUR

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI