Global Patent Index - EP 1260997 A2

EP 1260997 A2 2002-11-27 - Electromagnetic actuator

Title (en)

Electromagnetic actuator

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer Antrieb

Title (fr)

Actionneur électromagnétique

Publication

EP 1260997 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010452 A

Priority

JP 2001150651 A

Abstract (en)

An electromagnetic actuator (7) includes a pair of core assemblies (12a, 12b) and a spacer (24). The armature (11) is provided between the pair of core assemblies (12a, 12b). The spacer (24) is formed by molding to be integral with a coil (20) provided in electromagnets (30a, 30b) of the core assemblies (12a, 12b) and is located between the electromagnets (30a, 30b). And relative positions of the pair of electromagnets (30a and 30b) to each other are determined by the spacer (24). A space to allow the armature to reciprocate is secured between the core assemblies (12a, 12b) by the spacer (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01); H01F 7/127 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); H01F 7/127 (2013.01); H01F 7/1638 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1260997 A2 20021127; EP 1260997 A3 20030129; JP 2002343631 A 20021129; US 2002170512 A1 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01F 7/16 A, 7F 01L 9/04 B

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI