Global Patent Index - EP 1261000 A1

EP 1261000 A1 2002-11-27 - Electric citrcuit protection device having electrical parts ultrasonically joined using a brazing alloy

Title (en)

Electric citrcuit protection device having electrical parts ultrasonically joined using a brazing alloy

Title (de)

Elektrischer Schaltungsschutzeinrichtung mit Ultraschall geschweissten elektrische Teilen unter benützung von einer Hartlötlegierung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection de circuits électriques comportant des parties électriques jointes par ultrasons au moyen d'un alliage de brasage

Publication

EP 1261000 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02078046 A

Priority

  • EP 98947169 A
  • US 94133797 A
  • US 94133497 A

Abstract (en)

An electric conductor assembly comprising: an electrically conductive contact having a i constituent comprising a non-alloying material and further comprising silver; and an electrically conductive contact carrier comprising a predominance by weight of nonferrous material, mechanically joined together at a particular location by the application of ultrasonic energy, brazing material being disposed between the contact and the carrier at the location where they are joined. The brazing material comprises at least two materials, with elemental copper being the largest single constituent of the brazing material, and the contact comprises serrations in the surface joined to the brazing material, said serrations being filled with excess silver from the contact, the brazing material forming a layer overlapping the serrations. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/023 (2006.01); H01H 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/0231 (2013.01); H01H 11/042 (2013.01); H01H 1/5822 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917321 A1 19990408; DE 69814432 D1 20030612; DE 69814432 T2 20040318; DE 69819791 D1 20031218; DE 69819791 T2 20040923; EP 1019930 A1 20000719; EP 1019930 B1 20030507; EP 1261000 A1 20021127; EP 1261000 B1 20031112; ES 2199463 T3 20040216; ES 2211852 T3 20040716

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040922

2005-09-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040921

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211852 T3

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69819791 P 20031218

2003-11-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1019930 P

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NEWLAND, CHARLES ALLEN

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030121

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1019930

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT