Global Patent Index - EP 1261002 A1

EP 1261002 A1 2002-11-27 - SMALL SWITCH

Title (en)

SMALL SWITCH

Title (de)

KLEINSCHALTER

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR DE DIMENSION REDUITE

Publication

EP 1261002 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01976856 A

Priority

  • JP 0109458 W
  • JP 2000334009 A
  • JP 2000334010 A

Abstract (en)

A small-size switch is provided where a push-button (2) is lengthened in the stroke and can thus be positioned at higher accuracy, hence improving the utility and lowering the production cost. The push-button (2) has a first projection or fan shaped pivot pin (17) and a second projection (19) of a circular shape over the first projection (17) provided on each of two sides thereof. As the first projections (17) are fitted into two semi-circular holes (16) respectively provided in both side walls of a body (1), the second projections (19) engage directly with their corresponding recesses 20 provided in the inner surfaces of the side walls of the body (1) as well as the corresponding holes (16). The push-button (2) is pivotably movable about the pivot center (13) of its pivot pins (17) until the wall surface (17a) of each pivot pin (17) touches the edge of the semi-circular hole (16). Since the push-button (2) is supported at its pivot center by one end close to the opening of the body (1), no extra member for retaining the push-button (2) can be needed. Also, as the pivot pins (17) of the push-button (2) are fitted into the corresponding semi-circular holes (16) of the body (1) and their opening angle is sized smaller, the stroke of the push-button (2) can be lengthened. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 21/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/28 (2006.01); H01H 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/28 (2013.01); H01H 1/242 (2013.01); H01H 2001/5888 (2013.01); H01H 2003/326 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1261002 A1 20021127; EP 1261002 A4 20060823; AU 9601701 A 20020515; CN 1215508 C 20050817; CN 1394347 A 20030129; JP 4026498 B2 20071226; JP WO2002037517 A1 20040311; TW 517254 B 20030111; WO 0237517 A1 20020510

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS CO., LTD.

2009-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD

2008-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2008-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080207

2006-08-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060724

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI