Global Patent Index - EP 1261010 A1

EP 1261010 A1 2002-11-27 - Auxiliary device for a magnetothermal circuit breaker

Title (en)

Auxiliary device for a magnetothermal circuit breaker

Title (de)

Hilfseinrichtung für magnetothermischen Schutzschalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif auxiliaire pou disjoncteur magnétothermique

Publication

EP 1261010 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02011244 A

Priority

IT MI20011070 A

Abstract (en)

An auxiliary device for a magnetothermal circuit breaker, comprising an electrical protection unit that cooperates, by means of a mechanism, with an opening slider biased by a return spring, in order to define a release position, in which the electrical protection unit actuates the mechanism and releases the slider, which acts on the safety opening mechanism of the circuit breaker, and a rearming position, in which the spring is rearmed. The mechanism has a single actuation lever in which a first end cooperates with the electrical protection unit and a second end cooperates with the slider. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/12; H01H 83/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/12 (2006.01); H01H 83/20 (2006.01); H01H 71/10 (2006.01); H01H 71/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/12 (2013.01); H01H 83/20 (2013.01); H01H 71/1072 (2013.01); H01H 71/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1261010 A1 20021127; IT MI20011070 A1 20021122; IT MI20011070 D0 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070412

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030519

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI