Global Patent Index - EP 1261066 A2

EP 1261066 A2 2002-11-27 - Improvements in or relating to diplexer apparatus

Title (en)

Improvements in or relating to diplexer apparatus

Title (de)

Verbesserungen an oder in Bezug auf ein Diplexergerät

Title (fr)

Améliorations concernant un appareil duplexeur

Publication

EP 1261066 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02252898 A

Priority

IT TO20010483 A

Abstract (en)

A diplexer apparatus comprises a diplexer 111 coupled to a transmit port 112, a receive port 114 and to a horn 116 which is arranged to substantially simultaneously transmit a transmit signal 118 or receive a receive signal 120, the transmit and receive signals 118 and 120 being co-linearly polarised signals. The diplexer 111 has one or more internal surface variations that are arranged to allow substantial all of the transmit signal 118 to pass from the transmit port 112 whilst prohibiting the receive signal 120 from passing. The receive signal 120 is reflected by the diplexer 111 and passes to the receive port 114. The diplexer 111 acts as a frequency discriminator of co-linearly polarised signals 118 and 120. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/213

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/213 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2138 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1261066 A2 20021127; EP 1261066 A3 20030813; IT TO20010483 A1 20021125; IT TO20010483 D0 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111101

2009-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090313

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040212

- Countries: RO

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040212

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI