Global Patent Index - EP 1261068 A2

EP 1261068 A2 2002-11-27 - Cable clamp

Title (en)

Cable clamp

Title (de)

Kabelklemme

Title (fr)

Fixation de cable

Publication

EP 1261068 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450123 A

Priority

AT 8142001 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a base part and a cover forming a two-part with cable leadthrough openings enclosing contact parts for holding and fixing the cables. The cover consists of at least one cover element for attachment to the base part, on which at least one, preferably two dividing walls are mounted that can fold into a position normal to the contact part longitudinal direction and that dissect the volume bounded by the housing for the contact part. The device has a base part (3) and a cover forming a two-part housing that can be divided along a longitudinal axis and with cable leadthrough openings (9) enclosing contact parts for holding and fixing the cables (18). The cover (1) consists of at least one cover element (1A) for attachment to the base part, on which at least one, preferably two dividing walls (10) are mounted that can fold into a position normal to the longitudinal direction of the contact part (5) and that dissect the volume bounded by the housing for accommodating the contact part.

Abstract (de)

Kabelklemme für elektrische Leitungen (18). Um eine Kabelklemme zu schaffen, die eine einfache Schaltung der auf demselben elektrischen Potential befindlichen elektrischen Leitungen ermöglicht, ist vorgesehen, dass die Abdeckung (1) aus mindestens einem am Basisteil (3) befestigbaren Abdeckelement (1A) besteht, an welchem jeweils mindestens eine, vorzugsweise zwei in eine Position normal zur Erstreckungsrichtung des Kontaktbauteils (5) klappbare Trennwände (10) angeordnet sind, welche das durch das Gehäuse begrenzte Volumen zur Aufnahme des Kontaktbauteils (5) durchsetzen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2458 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1261068 A2 20021127; EP 1261068 A3 20050202; AT 410730 B 20030725; AT A8142001 A 20021115

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050809

2005-11-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-10-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI