Global Patent Index - EP 1261069 A1

EP 1261069 A1 2002-11-27 - Traction strain relief device

Title (en)

Traction strain relief device

Title (de)

Zugentlastungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de soulagement de contraintes de traction

Publication

EP 1261069 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02011205 A

Priority

DE 10125656 A

Abstract (en)

The device has first and second holding elements (11,13) movable between open and holding positions and lockable in the holding position with a section of flat conductor between them. A region of the flat cable's foil (16) with no conductors or only edges of conductors is clamped between a protrusion (22a) on the first element and a recess (26) in the second to provide strain relief. AN Independent claim is also included for a plug connector with an inventive device.

Abstract (de)

Eine Zugentlastungsvorrichtung für einen flexiblen Flachleiter, der eine Trägerfolie und gegebene Verteilung von Leiterbahnen darin aufweist, insbesondere FPC- und/oder FFC-Flachleiter, weist ein erstes Halteelement und ein zweites Halteelement auf, die zwischen einer offenen Position zum Einlegen des Flachleiters und einer Halteposition bewegbar und in der Halteposition gegeneinander arretierbar sind, wobei ein Abschnitt des flexiblen Flachleiters zwischen den beiden Halteelementen einschließbar ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/24; H01R 12/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/70 (2011.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5825 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1261069 A1 20021127; DE 10125656 A1 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081202

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-08-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI