Global Patent Index - EP 1261074 A1

EP 1261074 A1 2002-11-27 - Waterproof cable strain relief

Title (en)

Waterproof cable strain relief

Title (de)

Wasserdichte Kabelzugentlastung

Title (fr)

Dispositif serre câble résistant à l'eau

Publication

EP 1261074 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02008426 A

Priority

DE 20108775 U

Abstract (en)

The electrical cable (2) passes through a housing part (1) that is cylindrical and has an end section having a ring of angled radial claws (14). The inner surface is coated with a sealing material (20). When an end cap (12) is threaded onto the housing the claws are forced radially inwards to grip the cable and also provide a seal.

Abstract (de)

Zugentlastungsvorrichtung für ein Kabel in einer elektrischen Steckvorrichtung, umfassend: ein Gehäuseteil (1), durch das sich das Kabel (2, 3) erstreckt, einen Käfig (11) mit einer Ringwand (13) und einer Anzahl von Lamellen (14), die an der Ringwand angelenkt sind und zwischen denen sich schlitzförmige Lücken (16) befinden, eine Dichtung (20), die das Kabel (2, 3) umgibt und das Gehäuseteil (1) abdichtet, sowie ein ringförmiges Druckstück (12) zur Anlage an Schrägflächen (27) der Lamellen (14), um die Dichtung (20) an das Kabel (2, 3) zu pressen. Die Dichtung (20) ist mit den Lamellen (14) verbunden, um diese abzudichten und deren Bewegung zu folgen, und bildet eine engste Stelle für eine veränderbar große Kabeldurchführungsöffnung (21). Ferner reicht die Dichtung (20) axial bis zur Überdeckung mit der Ringwand (13), mit der sie abdichtend verbunden ist. Die Lamellen (14) erstrecken sich generell schräg zur Achse der Ringwand (13) und weisen im Bereich der Kabeldurchführungsöffnung (21) Klauen (17) auf, die auf den Mantel eines dickeren (2) oder dünneren (3) Kabels gepresst werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52; H01R 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5205 (2013.01); H01R 13/5837 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20108775 U1 20021010; AT 273573 T 20040815; DE 10222811 A1 20021128; DE 50200782 D1 20040916; DK 1261074 T3 20041122; EP 1261074 A1 20021127; EP 1261074 B1 20040811; ES 2222416 T3 20050201; PT 1261074 E 20041130

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-13 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2010-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090924

2009-12-30 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090924

2009-12-30 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090924

2009-12-22 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20091217

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BALS ELEKTROTECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BALS ELEKTROTECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PC ELECTRIC GMBH

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TECHNO S.R.L.

2005-08-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PC ELECTRIC GMBH

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-08-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECHNO S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PC ELECTRIC GMBH

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PC ELECTRIC GMBH

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-04-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-04-12 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222416 T3

2004-12-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040403837

2004-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-11-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-11-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200782 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030412

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI