Global Patent Index - EP 1261154 A2

EP 1261154 A2 2002-11-27 - System and method for navigation and positioning

Title (en)

System and method for navigation and positioning

Title (de)

Navigationsgerät und Verfahren zur Standortbestimmung

Title (fr)

Système et procédé de navigation et de localisation

Publication

EP 1261154 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02011238 A

Priority

DE 10125046 A

Abstract (en)

Navigation installation has an input device (8) for input of a target destination and a current location, a navigation computer (5) and storage (7). The navigation installation has a digital radio receiver (2) with the received signal including the location of the transmitter with the navigation computer able to determine the vehicle location when at least two radio signals are received. An Independent claim is made for a method for determining the location of a motor vehicle without the need for a location system, based on receipt of a digital radio signal from two or more transmitters that includes the transmitter locations. Alternatively, if the start location is known the vehicle velocity and direction can be determined with just one received digital signal, so that vehicle location can be determined at any particular time.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Navigationsgerät bzw. ein Verfahren zur Standortbestimmung vorgeschlagen, die dazu dienen, ohne eine Ortungsyorrichtung aus empfangenen digitalen Funksignalen, die eine Senderkennung aufweisen, den Standort des Empfängers zu bestimmen. Dabei werden insbesondere DAB-Rundfunksignale verwendet, die mit dem TII-Symbol eine Senderkennung aufweisen. Durch Ermittlung der Phasendifferenzen ist eine Bestimmung der Position des Empfängers beim Empfang von Rundfunksignalen von zwei Sendern möglich. Bei nur einem Sender ist die Bestimmung der Geschwindigkeit und damit der Bewegungsrichtung des Empfängers möglich. Durch die Anfangseingabe eines Standorts kann dann der Standort des Empfängers permanent verfolgt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 11/10; G01C 21/26; G01S 5/12; H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01C 21/26 (2006.01); G01S 5/12 (2006.01); G01S 11/10 (2006.01); H04H 60/51 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/51 (2013.01); G01C 21/26 (2013.01); G01S 5/12 (2013.01); G01S 11/10 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1261154 A2 20021127; EP 1261154 A3 20041124; DE 10125046 A1 20021205

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101201

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-08-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-07-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050524

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01S 11/10 A

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01S 5/12 B

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01C 21/26 B

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04H 1/00 B

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI