Global Patent Index - EP 1261213 A1

EP 1261213 A1 2002-11-27 - Projection-type display apparatus

Title (en)

Projection-type display apparatus

Title (de)

Projektions-Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage de type projection

Publication

EP 1261213 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02077916 A

Priority

  • EP 94910021 A
  • JP 5595293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6120152A] A projection-type display apparatus includes a light source, a uniform illumination optical system, a color separating system for separating a white light beam emitted from the uniform illumination optical system into three color beams, three liquid crystal panels for respectively modulating each of the separated color beams, a light guide system located on an optical path of the color beam having the longest optical path among the separated color beams, a dichroic prism for synthesizing the beams modulated through the liquid crystal panels, and a projection lens for projecting the synthesized and modulated beam onto a screen. The uniform illumination optical system is provided with a uniform illumination optical device for converting the white light beam emitted from the light source into a uniform beam. Since the dichroic prism, which is an optical element that is rotationally symmetrical about the chief axis of a projection optical system, is employed as a color synthesizing system, and the uniform illumination optical device for restricting unevenness in color and luminous intensity is incorporated in the system, it is possible to realize a display apparatus which causes little unevenness in color and luminous intensity and which has a high illumination efficiency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 9/31; H04N 5/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 21/20 (2006.01); G03B 33/12 (2006.01); H04N 9/31 (2006.01); H04N 5/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 3/0043 (2013.01); G02B 3/005 (2013.01); G02B 3/0056 (2013.01); G02B 3/0062 (2013.01); G03B 21/208 (2013.01); G03B 33/12 (2013.01); H04N 9/3105 (2013.01); H04N 9/3167 (2013.01); H04N 5/7441 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] US 4943154 A 19900724 - MIYATAKE YOSHITO [JP], et al
  • [AD] EP 0395156 A1 19901031 - KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 309 (P - 1382) 8 July 1992 (1992-07-08)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 320 (P - 1558) 17 June 1993 (1993-06-17)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6120152 A 20000919; DE 69433318 D1 20031218; DE 69433318 T2 20040916; DE 69433600 D1 20040408; DE 69433600 T2 20050203; EP 0646828 A1 19950405; EP 0646828 A4 19950719; EP 0646828 B1 20031112; EP 1257128 A1 20021113; EP 1257128 B1 20040303; EP 1261213 A1 20021127; HK 1014584 A1 20040528; JP 3254680 B2 20020212; TW 249846 B 19950621; US 2002057420 A1 20020516; US 5626409 A 19970506; US 6309073 B1 20011030; WO 9422042 A1 19940929

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100401

2006-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061116

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 646828

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB