Global Patent Index - EP 1261314 A4

EP 1261314 A4 2003-06-11 - METHODS USING PHYTOL TO IMPROVE THE APPEARANCE OF SKIN AND COMPOSITIONS FOR SUCH METHODS

Title (en)

METHODS USING PHYTOL TO IMPROVE THE APPEARANCE OF SKIN AND COMPOSITIONS FOR SUCH METHODS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON PHYTOL UM DAS ERSCHEINUNGSBILD DER HAUT ZU VERBESSERN UND ZUBEREITUNGEN FÜR SOLCHE VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

METHODES UTILISANT DU PHYTOL DESTINEES A L'AMELIORATION DE L'APPARENCE DE LA PEAU ET COMPOSITIONS CORRESPONDANTES

Publication

EP 1261314 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01910453 A

Priority

  • US 0103965 W
  • US 52144200 A
  • US 19098900 P
  • US 19098800 P
  • US 72435600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0166080A1] There are provided methods of enhancing the appearance of human skin comprising applying a composition having (i) phytol in an amount about 0.0001 wt% to about 50 wt% based on the total weight of the composition, and (ii) at least one retinoid in an amount about 0.001 wt% to about 1.5 wt% based on the total weight of the composition. Alternatively, the composition used in the method for enhancing the appearance of human skin may have phytol and perilla oil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/368 (2006.01); A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61K 8/99 (2006.01); A61K 38/01 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/02 (2006.01); A61Q 19/06 (2006.01); A61Q 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/361 (2013.01); A61K 8/342 (2013.01); A61K 8/368 (2013.01); A61K 8/671 (2013.01); A61K 8/922 (2013.01); A61K 8/99 (2013.01); A61K 38/018 (2013.01); A61Q 5/00 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61Q 19/02 (2013.01); A61Q 19/06 (2013.01); A61Q 19/08 (2013.01); A61K 2800/70 (2013.01); A61Q 19/007 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 38/018 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0166080 A1 20010913; EP 1261314 A1 20021204; EP 1261314 A4 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-19 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080211

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MENON, GOPINATHAN, K.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PTCHELINTSEV, DMITRI, S.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAHALINGAM, HARISH

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/01 A

2003-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MENON, GOPINATHAN, K.

2003-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PTCHELINTSEV, DMITRI, S.

2003-05-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAHALINGAM, HARISH

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR