Global Patent Index - EP 1261354 A1

EP 1261354 A1 2002-12-04 - DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR GENE THERAPY

Title (en)

DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR GENE THERAPY

Title (de)

APPLIKATIONS-SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GENTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ADMINISTRATION POUR THERAPIE GENIQUE

Publication

EP 1261354 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00904645 A

Priority

  • US 0002628 W
  • US 49567500 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/715; A61K 48/00; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/715 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1261354 A1 20021204; EP 1261354 A4 20040915

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080822

2007-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROSPECT THERAPEUTICS, INC.

2007-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GLYCOGENESYS, INC.

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060821

2004-09-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/715 A

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 B

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 J

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31:715 J

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI