Global Patent Index - EP 1261369 A2

EP 1261369 A2 2002-12-04 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TUMOR-TARGETED DELIVERY OF EFFECTOR MOLECULES

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TUMOR-TARGETED DELIVERY OF EFFECTOR MOLECULES

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUM TUMORGERICHTETEN TRANSPORT VON EFFEKTORMOLEKÜLEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES D'ADMINISTRATION DE MOLECULES EFFECTRICES CIBLEES SUR LES TUMEURS

Publication

EP 1261369 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00957764 A

Priority

  • US 0023242 W
  • US 15750099 P
  • US 15758199 P
  • US 15763799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0125397A2] The present application discloses the preparation and use of attenuated tumor-targeted bacteria vectors for the delivery of one or more primary effector molecule(s) to the site of a solid tumor. The primary effector molecule(s) of the invention is used in the methods of the invention to treat a solid tumor cancer such as a carcinoma, melanoma, lymphoma, or sarcoma. The invention relates to the surprising discovery that effector molecules, which may be toxic when administered systemically to a host, can be delivered locally to tumors by attenuated tumor-targeted bacteria with reduced toxicity to the host. The application also discloses the delivery of one or more optional effector molecule(s) (termed secondary effector molecules) which may be delivered by the attenuated tumor-targeted bacteria in conjunction with the primary effector molecule(s).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/02; A61K 39/112; A61P 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/74 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/19 (2006.01); A61K 38/20 (2006.01); A61K 38/39 (2006.01); A61K 38/43 (2006.01); A61K 38/46 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/035 (2006.01); C07K 14/16 (2006.01); C07K 14/225 (2006.01); C07K 14/50 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 1/36 (2006.01); C12N 15/62 (2006.01); C12N 15/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/162 (2013.01); A61K 35/74 (2013.01); A61K 38/164 (2013.01); A61K 38/177 (2013.01); A61K 38/191 (2013.01); A61K 38/195 (2013.01); A61K 38/39 (2013.01); A61K 38/51 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 48/0008 (2013.01); C12N 15/62 (2013.01); C12N 15/625 (2013.01); C12N 15/74 (2013.01); C07K 2319/01 (2013.01); C07K 2319/035 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 35/74 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 38/191 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 38/177 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 38/164 + A61K 2300/00
  5. A61K 38/39 + A61K 2300/00
  6. A61K 38/195 + A61K 2300/00
  7. A61K 38/51 + A61K 2300/00
  8. A61K 38/162 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0125397 A2 20010412; WO 0125397 A3 20020124; AU 6933400 A 20010510; AU 783714 B2 20051201; BR 0014491 A 20040309; CA 2386465 A1 20010412; CN 1420783 A 20030528; EP 1261369 A2 20021204; EP 1261369 A4 20060201; IL 148933 D0 20020912; JP 2004500042 A 20040108; MX PA02003384 A 20020820; NZ 518354 A 20050225

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110521

2006-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-02-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/02 A

2005-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/112 B

2005-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/00 B

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI