Global Patent Index - EP 1261396 A1

EP 1261396 A1 2002-12-04 - INERT RENDERING METHOD WITH A NITROGEN BUFFER

Title (en)

INERT RENDERING METHOD WITH A NITROGEN BUFFER

Title (de)

INERTISIERUNGSVERFAHREN MIT STICKSTOFFPUFFER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INERTISATION AU MOYEN D'UN TAMPON D'AZOTE

Publication

EP 1261396 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01273102 A

Priority

  • DE 0104245 W
  • DE 10101079 A
  • DE 10121550 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2003226669A1] The invention relates to an inert rendering method for preventing and/or extinguishing fires in enclosed spaces, wherein an oxygen-inhibiting gas is introduced into the target area in order to adjust a first basic level of inertion with a reduced oxygen content in comparison with natural conditions, and wherein an oxygen-inhibiting gas is further introduced in a gradual or sudden manner (in the case of a fire) into the target area in order to adjust one or more levels of inertion with a similarly reduced oxygen content. The invention also relates to a device for carrying out the method, comprising an oxygen-measuring device in the target area and a source of an oxygen-inhibiting gas. The aim of the invention is to provide an inert rendering method and device for carrying out said method enabling the storage of extinguishing gas needed to extinguish a fire in a simple, economical manner without having to resort to premises which are normally specially provided therefor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 3/00 (2006.01); A62C 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 02055155A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2003226669 A1 20031211; US 7156184 B2 20070102; AT 330673 T 20060715; AU 2002221560 B2 20060914; CA 2408676 A1 20021114; CA 2408676 C 20090120; CN 1251775 C 20060419; CN 1427733 A 20030702; CZ 20031232 A3 20030813; CZ 298794 B6 20080130; DE 50110253 D1 20060803; DK 1261396 T3 20060821; EP 1261396 A1 20021204; EP 1261396 B1 20060621; ES 2264678 T3 20070116; JP 2004516910 A 20040610; JP 4105548 B2 20080625; NO 20031842 A 20030424; NO 20031842 D0 20030424; NO 335357 B1 20141201; PL 195429 B1 20070928; PL 357445 A1 20040726; PT 1261396 E 20061031; RU 2002132660 A 20040327; RU 2266767 C2 20051227; WO 02055155 A1 20020718

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180626

2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2017-03-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: DUFOURSTRASSE 116, 8008 ZUERICH (CH)

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20060403034

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160512

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151113

2016-08-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160602

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151112

2016-06-27 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-05-19 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160512

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20141107

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121112

2012-06-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20111109

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 330673 T

- Effective date: 20120418

2012-05-28 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WAGNER DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-05-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-03-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120328

2012-03-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-03-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-02-29 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WAGNER ALARM- UND SICHERUNGSSYSTEME GMBH, DE

2011-12-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111201 AND 20111207

2011-12-28 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111221

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2007-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2264678 T3

2006-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-10-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-10-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060403034

2006-08-21 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110253 P 20060803

2006-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060704

2006-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FELBER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI