Global Patent Index - EP 1261420 A1

EP 1261420 A1 2002-12-04 - MICROCAPSULE, IN PARTICULAR, FOR IMMOBILIZING ORGANIC OR INORGANIC SOLIDS, LIQUIDS AND/OR GASES

Title (en)

MICROCAPSULE, IN PARTICULAR, FOR IMMOBILIZING ORGANIC OR INORGANIC SOLIDS, LIQUIDS AND/OR GASES

Title (de)

MIKROKAPSEL INSBESONDERE ZUR IMMOBILISIERUNG VON ORGANISCHEN ODER ANORGANISCHEN FESTSTOFFEN, FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND/ODER GASEN

Title (fr)

MICROCAPSULE S'UTILISANT NOTAMMENT POUR IMMOBILISER DES SOLIDES, DES LIQUIDES ORGANIQUES OU INORGANIQUES ET/OU DES GAZ

Publication

EP 1261420 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01919290 A

Priority

  • DE 10009440 A
  • EP 0101743 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0164329A1] The invention relates to a microcapsule, in particular, for immobilizing organic or inorganic solids, liquids and/or gases, which is to be used in the fields of food engineering, pharmaceuticals and/or chemistry. The inventive microcapsule comprises a preferably spherical core containing the substance to be immobilized and comprises a covering that encloses said core. According to the invention, a phase limit that prevents the diffusion of small molecules is formed out of two substances, which are preferably liquid and which cannot be mixed with one another, inside the capsule or in the capsule covering.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/50 (2006.01); B01J 13/02 (2006.01); B01J 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/5089 (2013.01); A61K 9/1694 (2013.01); B01J 13/02 (2013.01); B01J 13/04 (2013.01); A61K 9/1652 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0164329A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0164329 A1 20010907; WO 0164329 A8 20011206; AU 4644001 A 20010912; CA 2401689 A1 20010907; EP 1261420 A1 20021204; US 2003129248 A1 20030710

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090227

2006-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-06-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAVIS MICROCAPS GMBH

2005-06-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DR RAINER POMMERSHEIM

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI