Global Patent Index - EP 1261425 A1

EP 1261425 A1 2002-12-04 - TEST SYSTEM BASED ON MICROCAPILLARIES

Title (en)

TEST SYSTEM BASED ON MICROCAPILLARIES

Title (de)

TESTSYSTEM AUF BASIS VON MIKROKAPILLAREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TEST A BASE DE MICROCAPILLAIRES

Publication

EP 1261425 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01915235 A

Priority

  • DE 10008906 A
  • EP 0101566 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162385A1] The invention relates to a test system based on microcapillaries for determining the presence of a constituent in a liquid sample, preferably of an analyte in a body fluid and, in particular, glucose in the blood.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/66 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); G01N 1/00 (2006.01); G01N 30/02 (2006.01); G01N 30/04 (2006.01); G01N 30/56 (2006.01); G01N 30/88 (2006.01); G01N 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/5027 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0825 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0838 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0406 (2013.01); G01N 2035/00237 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162385A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162385 A1 20010830; AU 4238901 A 20010903; CN 1411395 A 20030416; DE 10008906 A1 20010830; EP 1261425 A1 20021204; JP 2003524164 A 20030812; US 2003013147 A1 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051101

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI