Global Patent Index - EP 1261528 A1

EP 1261528 A1 2002-12-04 - COLLAPSIBLE CONTAINER

Title (en)

COLLAPSIBLE CONTAINER

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENLEGBARER BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT PLIANT

Publication

EP 1261528 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01927681 A

Priority

  • DE 10009272 A
  • EP 0101933 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162609A1] The invention relates to a collapsible container (1) provided with a bottom (2), which consists of a plastic shaped part and on whose lateral wall (7) grooves (8) extend. The collapsible container is also provided with lateral walls (3), which are joined in a collapsible manner to the vertical container edges and which are to inserted into said grooves (8), and is provided with a supporting base (13). The design of the collapsible container is improved in that the supporting base (13) is fastened as an optionally foldable part to a lateral wall (3) or in that two folding parts (14) which, together, form the supporting base (13) are fastened to two opposing lateral walls (3). The number of parts to be manipulated is reduced by virtue of the fact that the supporting base is no longer provided as a separate part. The labor associated with the supporting base is limited to folding the folding part(s) against the lateral wall(s) when collapsing the container, and is limited to folding out of said folding part(s) when erecting the container. In addition, the container is considerably stabilized when filled. The item(s) placed therein press(es), with the weight thereof that presses against the folding part(s), the four lateral walls downward and into the grooves and recesses of the bottom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 19/06; B65D 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/22 (2006.01); B65D 6/24 (2006.01); B65D 6/26 (2006.01); B65D 19/06 (2006.01); B65D 19/20 (2006.01); B65D 19/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/20 (2013.01); B65D 19/06 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00034 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00069 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00159 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00208 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00268 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00288 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00318 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00338 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00412 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00427 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00497 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00527 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00557 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00597 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00621 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00641 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00711 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00915 (2013.01); B65D 2519/0093 (2013.01); B65D 2519/0099 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162609A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20009545 U1 20010705; BR 0108673 A 20021112; CN 1138683 C 20040218; CN 1406192 A 20030326; DE 10009272 A1 20010913; DE 20006670 U1 20010712; EP 1261528 A1 20021204; EP 1261528 B1 20031203; ES 2211800 T3 20040716; JP 2003523898 A 20030812; JP 4817578 B2 20111116; MX PA02007979 A 20021129; US 2003071038 A1 20030417; US 6805254 B2 20041019; WO 0162609 A1 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-08-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211800 T3

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101079 P 20040115

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR