Global Patent Index - EP 1261607 A1

EP 1261607 A1 2002-12-04 - 2,4-DISUBSTITUTED THIAZOLYL DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

2,4-DISUBSTITUTED THIAZOLYL DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

2,4-DISUBSTITUIERTE THIAZOLYL DERIVATE

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE THIAZOLYLE 2,4-DISUBSTITUE

Publication

EP 1261607 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01909776 A

Priority

  • EP 01909776 A
  • EP 0101841 W
  • EP 00200733 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0164674A1] This invention concerns the use of a compound of formula (I'), an (N)-oxide, pharmaceutically acceptable addition salt, quaternary amine and stereochemically isomeric form thereof, wherein Q is optionally substituted C3-6cycloalkyl, phenyl, naphthyl, pyridyl, pyrimidinyl, pyrazinyl, pyridazinyl, benzthiazolyl, benzoxazolyl, benzimidazolyl, indazolyl, or imidazopyridyl; or Q is a radical of formula (b-1, b-2, b-3), wherein X and Y each independently are O, NR<3>, CH2 or S, with R<3> being hydrogen or C1-4alkyl; q is 1 to 4; Z is O or NR<4> with R<4> being hydrogen or C1-4alkyl; r is 1 to 3; L is optionally substituted phenyl or L is Het with Het being an optionally substituted five- or six-membered heterocyclic ring or an optionally substituted bicyclic heterocyclic ring; for the manufacture of a medicament for the prevention or the treatment of diseases mediated through cytokines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 417/04; A61K 31/425; A61P 29/00; C07D 277/42; C07D 417/12; C07D 417/14; C07D 471/04; C07D 487/04; C07D 513/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 277/20 (2006.01); A61K 31/425 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/427 (2006.01); A61K 31/429 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61K 31/4985 (2006.01); A61K 31/5025 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 277/42 (2006.01); C07D 417/04 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/14 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01); C07D 519/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 417/04 (2013.01); C07D 277/42 (2013.01); C07D 417/14 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01); C07D 487/04 (2013.01); C07D 513/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0164674A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0164674 A1 20010907; AR 030553 A1 20030827; AT 414079 T 20081115; AU 2001237401 B2 20061109; AU 3740101 A 20010912; CA 2397661 A1 20010907; CA 2397661 C 20120103; DE 60136530 D1 20081224; EP 1261607 A1 20021204; EP 1261607 B1 20081112; ES 2317889 T3 20090501; JP 2003525291 A 20030826; MY 141597 A 20100531; US 2003203897 A1 20031030; US 2006211704 A1 20060921; US 7105550 B2 20060912; US 7893280 B2 20110222

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090220

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090213

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2009-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-09-25 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1051036

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090413

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2317889 T3

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-03-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136530 P 20081224

2008-12-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LOVE, CHRISTOPHER

2008-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN WAUWE, JEAN PIERRE FRANS

2008-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DE BRABANDER, MARC

2008-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COOYMANS, LUDWIG

2008-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VANDERMAESEN, NELE

2008-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KENNIS, LUDO EDMOND JOSEPHINE

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060725

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060725

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20021001;LT PAYMENT 20021001;LV PAYMENT 20021001;MK PAYMENT 20021001;RO PAYMENT 20021001;SI PAYMENT 20021001