Global Patent Index - EP 1261736 A4

EP 1261736 A4 2004-12-29 - METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO PREADIPOCYTE FACTOR-1-LIKE (PREF-1-LIKE) POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (en)

METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO PREADIPOCYTE FACTOR-1-LIKE (PREF-1-LIKE) POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN, POLYPEPTIDE UND POLYNUKLEOTIDE, ASSOZIIERT MIT "PREADIPOCYTE FACTOR-1" (PREF-1)

Title (fr)

METHODES ET MATERIAUX ASSOCIES A DES POLYPEPTIDES ET DES POLYNUCLEOTIDES DU TYPE FACTEUR-1 DES PREADIPOCYTES (DU TYPE PREF-1)

Publication

EP 1261736 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01906704 A

Priority

  • US 0102611 W
  • US 49140400 A
  • US 65100800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157233A2] The invention provides novel polynucleotides and polypeptides encoded by such polynucleotides and mutants or variants thereof that correspond to a novel human secreted Pref-1-like polypeptide. These polynucleotides comprise nucleic acid sequences isolated from cDNA library from adult human brain (Hyseq clone identification numbers 7958079 (SEQ ID NO:1)). Other aspects of the invention include vectors containing processes for producing novel human secreted Pref-1-like polypeptides, and antibodies specific for such polypeptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C07H 21/02; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/705

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 21/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/70503 (2013.01); C07K 14/475 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 0134768 A2 20010517 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 0166690 A2 20010913 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL EBI; 12 July 1999 (1999-07-12), NCI-CGAP: "nr33c08.x5 NCI_CGAP_Pr22 Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:1169774 3' similar to TR:Q25059 Q25059 FIBROPELLIN III ;, mRNA sequence.", XP002303947, Database accession no. AI821806
  • See also references of WO 0157233A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157233 A2 20010809; WO 0157233 A3 20020307; AU 3458201 A 20010814; CA 2398215 A1 20010809; EP 1261736 A2 20021204; EP 1261736 A4 20041229; JP 2003521928 A 20030722

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051108

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-12-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041116

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 A

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/00 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/02 B

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/705 B

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO, INC.

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO INC.

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI