Global Patent Index - EP 1261743 A2

EP 1261743 A2 2002-12-04 - NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (en)

NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (de)

NEUARTIGE NUKLEINSÄURE UND POLYPEPTIDE

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET POLYPEPTIDES

Publication

EP 1261743 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01918174 A

Priority

  • US 0104942 W
  • US 51970500 A
  • US 57445400 A
  • US 59619300 A
  • US 61684700 A
  • US 66536300 A
  • US 69326700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0166689A2] The present invention provides novel nucleic acids, novel polypeptide sequences encoded by these nucleic acids and uses thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/435; A61K 38/00; C07H 21/02; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/63; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0166689A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0166689 A2 20010913; WO 0166689 A3 20020530; AU 4528001 A 20010917; CA 2402293 A1 20010913; EP 1261743 A2 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/435 A

2005-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/11 B

2005-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/63 B

2005-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/00 B

2005-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2005-08-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/02 B

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO, INC.

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO INC.

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI