Global Patent Index - EP 1261827 A1

EP 1261827 A1 2002-12-04 - REACTOR AND METHOD FOR GASIFYING AND/OR MELTING MATERIALS

Title (en)

REACTOR AND METHOD FOR GASIFYING AND/OR MELTING MATERIALS

Title (de)

REAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERGASEN UND/ODER SCHMELZEN VON STOFFEN

Title (fr)

REACTEUR ET PROCEDE DE GAZEIFICATION ET/OU DE FUSION DE MATIERES

Publication

EP 1261827 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01911636 A

Priority

  • DE 10007115 A
  • EP 0101581 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0161246A1] The invention relates to a reactor for gasifying and/or melting feed materials, comprising the following: a delivery section (1) by which means the feed materials are introduced; a pyrolysis section (8), which adjoins the preceding section, hereby expanding the cross-section; gas supply means (10) which open into the pyrolysis section (8) approximately at the level of the expanded cross-section and by which means hot gases are supplied to a discharge cone (9); a melting and overheating section (14) which adjoins the pyrolysis section (8); upper feeding-in means (15) for introducing a medium that is rich in energy into the melting and overheating section (14); a reduction section (20) comprising gas extraction means (21), by which means excess gases are extracted; a hearth (25) which is situated beneath the reduction section (20), for collecting and diverting molten metals and slag; and lower feeding-in means (26), by which means a medium that is rich in energy is introduced directly above the melts and below the gas extraction means (21). The invention also relates to a method for gasifying and/or melting feed materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/027; C10J 3/26; F23G 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/00 (2006.01); C10J 3/26 (2006.01); C10J 3/66 (2006.01); F23G 5/027 (2006.01); F23G 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/0276 (2013.01); C10J 3/26 (2013.01); C10J 3/66 (2013.01); C10J 3/74 (2013.01); F23G 5/24 (2013.01); C10J 2200/152 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0946 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0959 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1223 (2013.01); F23G 2202/101 (2013.01); F23G 2202/104 (2013.01); F23G 2202/106 (2013.01); F23G 2205/16 (2013.01); F23G 2205/18 (2013.01); F23G 2207/20 (2013.01); F23G 2900/50002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0161246A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0161246 A1 20010823; WO 0161246 A8 20011115; AT 310208 T 20051215; AU 4061501 A 20010827; BR 0108578 A 20030429; BR 0108578 B1 20091201; CA 2400234 A1 20010823; CA 2400234 C 20100112; CN 1212487 C 20050727; CN 1404566 A 20030319; CZ 20022908 A3 20030115; CZ 305021 B6 20150401; DE 10007115 A1 20010906; DE 10007115 C2 20020627; DE 50108084 D1 20051222; DK 1261827 T3 20060703; EA 004195 B1 20040226; EA 200200854 A1 20021226; EP 1261827 A1 20021204; EP 1261827 B1 20051116; EP 1261827 B8 20060125; ES 2253356 T3 20060601; HU 0300690 A2 20030728; HU 228016 B1 20120828; JP 2003527554 A 20030916; JP 4426150 B2 20100303; MX PA02007967 A 20040405; PL 193225 B1 20070131; PL 357563 A1 20040726; SK 12912002 A3 20050602; SK 288020 B6 20121105; US 2003010267 A1 20030116; US 6662735 B2 20031216; ZA 200206571 B 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160214

2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20060400602

- Effective date: 20160905

2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160213

2017-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160213

2016-11-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160213

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160213

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160214

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160905

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160816

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-11-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160213

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 310208 T

- Effective date: 20160213

2016-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160213

2016-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-09-26 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20150202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150209

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-07-03 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-06-26 [REG DK EGE] RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS: APPROVED

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253356 T3

2006-05-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060400602

2006-04-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20051116

2006-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060314

2006-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: KBI INTERNATIONAL LTD

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KBI INTERNATIONAL LTD

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108084 P 20051222

2005-12-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-06 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040801

2005-04-06 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20050502

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 20020917;LV;MK;RO;SI