Global Patent Index - EP 1261928 A2

EP 1261928 A2 2002-12-04 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VALUING LOAN PORTFOLIOS USING FUZZY CLUSTERING

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VALUING LOAN PORTFOLIOS USING FUZZY CLUSTERING

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEWERTEN VON KREDIT-PORTFOLIOS MIT HILFE EINER UNSCHARFEN CLUSTER-BILDUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'EVALUER LES PORTEFEUILLES DE PRETS AU MOYEN D'UNE CLASSIFICATION FLOUE

Publication

EP 1261928 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00982309 A

Priority

  • US 0032592 W
  • US 16849999 P
  • US 56188600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141016A2] This disclosure describes a system and method for the valuation of loan portfolios using clustering logic. The system of this disclosure includes an assets acquisition logic that acquires a plurality of assets and attaches a plurality of variables to the plurality of assets in an assets database. Segmentation logic examines the plurality of assets and variables with a model. A fuzzy clustering logic calculates a value of the plurality of assets and variables, and a profitability analysis logic calculates a profilitability of the plurality of assets. The method valuates loan portfolios using clustering logic. The method includes the steps of acquiring a plurality of assets and attaching a plurality of variables to the assets. The plurality of assets and variables are examined with a model using fuzzy clustering to calculate the value of the plurality of assets and variables. The profitability of the plurality of assets is then calculated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06N 7/02 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141016 A2 20010607; WO 0141016 A8 20020207; AU 1935901 A 20010612; BR 0016142 A 20021224; CN 1630867 A 20050622; EP 1261928 A2 20021204; JP 2003526848 A 20030909; MX PA02005432 A 20021129; PL 358525 A1 20040809

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061018

2004-06-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI