Global Patent Index - EP 1261969 A1

EP 1261969 A1 2002-12-04 - DEVICE FOR READING, RECORDING AND RESTORING DIGITAL DATA IN A COPY-PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR SAID DATA

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR READING, RECORDING AND RESTORING DIGITAL DATA IN A COPY-PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR SAID DATA

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM LESEN, SOWIE ZUR AUFZEICHNUNG UND WIEDERGABE VON DIGITALEN DATEN IN EINEM SCHUTZSYSTEM GEGEN DIE KOPIE DERSELBEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS DE LECTURE, D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DE RESTITUTION DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES DANS UN SYSTEME DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA COPIE DESDITES DONNEES

Publication

EP 1261969 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01909915 A

Priority

  • FR 0100572 W
  • FR 0004222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0175876A1] The invention concerns a device for reading digital data (10) receiving data representing a content designed to be connected to a digital home network. It comprises: first means for encrypting (13) data in accordance with a protection mode specific to a line whereby the device is to be connected to another digital network device, the encrypted data being in that case supplied to a first output (S1); and second means for encrypting (14) data in accordance with a mode specific to the home network, the encrypted data being in that case supplied to a second output (S2). The invention also concerns a device for recording and restoring digital data designed to be connected to said reading device (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 20/00; H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/14 (2006.01); G06F 21/24 (2006.01); G09C 5/00 (2006.01); G11B 20/00 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); H04L 9/14 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 63/0428 (2013.01); G11B 20/00086 (2013.01); G11B 20/0021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0175876A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0175876 A1 20011011; AU 3750601 A 20011015; CN 1249713 C 20060405; CN 1419695 A 20030521; EP 1261969 A1 20021204; JP 2003529874 A 20031007; MX PA02009435 A 20030212; US 2003051153 A1 20030313

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-04-26 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2008-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071213

2005-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI