Global Patent Index - EP 1261970 A2

EP 1261970 A2 2002-12-04 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SPOILING COMPACT DISCS

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SPOILING COMPACT DISCS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERNICHTUNG VON COMPACT DISCS

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DESTRUCTION DE DISQUES COMPACTS

Publication

EP 1261970 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01902499 A

Priority

  • GB 0100337 W
  • GB 0001797 A
  • GB 0022472 A
  • US 19988302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0156030A2] Apparatus for rendering a compact disc unplayable comprises first and second pressing elements and at least one spoiling element interposed between the pressing elements. The pressing elements are adapted to be brought together to press the spoiling element against a disc placed therebetween thus causing damage to the information bearing surface of the disc. In a preferred embodiment, the or each spoiling element includes scraping means which may comprise a serrated blade or an abrasive material. Rotation of the disc relative to the scraping means when the disc is sandwiched between the pressing elements results in the disc's information bearing surface being scratched or otherwise damaged. A method of rendering unplayable a compact disc is also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 23/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/02 (2006.01); B26B 27/00 (2006.01); B29B 17/04 (2006.01); G11B 23/50 (2006.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29B 17/04 (2013.01); G11B 23/505 (2013.01); B29B 2017/0452 (2013.01); B29B 2017/0484 (2013.01); B29L 2017/005 (2013.01); G11B 7/26 (2013.01); Y02W 30/521 (2015.05); Y02W 30/625 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0156030A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0156030 A2 20010802; WO 0156030 A3 20020314; CA 2398299 A1 20010802; EP 1261970 A2 20021204; JP 2003520657 A 20030708

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-03-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILLER, HOWARD IRA

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDEA INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2004-02-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SPOILING COMPACT DISCS

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020820

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI