Global Patent Index - EP 1262083 A2

EP 1262083 A2 2002-12-04 - METHOD FOR AN INTERSYSTEM CONNECTION HANDOVER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR AN INTERSYSTEM CONNECTION HANDOVER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR INTERSYSTEM-VERBINDUNGSWEITERSCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT DE CONNEXION ENTRE SYSTEMES

Publication

EP 1262083 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01919169 A

Priority

  • DE 0100843 W
  • DE 10010958 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10010958A1] The method involves comparing a transmission quality determined by a first subscriber station (UE) w.r.t. transmission characteristics to a base station (BST) in a first radio communications system (RAT1) with a threshold and, if the threshold is not achieved, initiating determination of transmission quality for transmission characteristics to a base station (NB) in a second communications system (RAT2) until a separate criterion from the threshold is fulfilled.

[origin: DE10010958A1] The method involves comparing a transmission quality determined by a first subscriber station (UE) w.r.t. transmission characteristics to a base station (BST) in a first radio communications system (RAT1) with a threshold and, if the threshold is not achieved, initiating determination of transmission quality for transmission characteristics to a base station (NB) in a second communications system (RAT2) until a separate criterion from the threshold is fulfilled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/14 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/30 (2013.01); H04W 36/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0167784A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10010958 A1 20010920; CN 1268164 C 20060802; CN 1416660 A 20030507; EP 1262083 A2 20021204; US 2003050063 A1 20030313; US 7215962 B2 20070508; WO 0167784 A2 20010913; WO 0167784 A3 20020314

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080911

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060818

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT TR

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR