Global Patent Index - EP 1262121 A2

EP 1262121 A2 2002-12-04 - Method and device for manufacturing a brush

Title (en)

Method and device for manufacturing a brush

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen einer Bürste

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de fabrication d'une brosse

Publication

EP 1262121 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010360 A

Priority

DE 10126631 A

Abstract (en)

To produce a brush, and especially a toothbrush, a strand (4) of a single filament or a filament bundle is drawn off a bobbin (2) to a cutter (12), where a given length is severed. The cut filaments are carried by an air stream to be fitted to the brush carrier. The cut length is carried through a guide channel (16) to at least one holding channel (22), preferably at the perforated field plate (6) covering the injection mold, to form the toothbrush body.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Herstellen einer Bürste. Bei dem Verfahren wird ein Strang eines Einzelfilamentes oder eines Filamentbündels von einer Spule abgewickelt und an einer Schneideinrichtung vorbeigeführt, in welcher ein vorbestimmtes Längenstück des Stranges von diesem abgeschnitten wird. Danach wird das Längenstück mit einem Borstenträger verbunden wird. Zur Erhöhung der Produktivität wird mit der Erfindung vorgeschlagen, den Strang bzw. das Längenstück nach dem Ablängen durch eine Luftströmung zu fördern. Hierdurch kann die Gefahr eines Knickens eines Filamentes beim Fördern des Stranges ausgeschlossen werden. Die erfindungsgemäße Vorrichtung weist in an sich bekannter Weise wenigstens eine Spule auf, die einen Strang eines Einzelfilamentes oder eines Filamentbündels bereit hält. Darüber hinaus ist eine erste Führungseinrichtung mit einem Abwickelführungskanal für jeden Strang und eine zweite Führungseinrichtung, die der ersten Führungseinrichtung nachgeordnet ist und die einen mit dem Abwickelführungskanal fluchtenden Führungskanal aufweist, vorgesehen. Schließlich ist eine den zugeführten Strang auf Länge schneidende Klinge sowie eine an dem Strang ziehende Fördereinrichtung zum Abwickeln des Stranges von der Spule vorgesehen. Zur Vereinfachung der Vorrichtung und insbesondere zur Reduktion der bewegten Massen wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, eine Druckquelle oder -senke vorzusehen, welche mit dem Abwickelführungskanal und/oder dem Führungskanal kommuniziert und welche in dem jeweiligen Kanal eine in Förderrichtung des Stranges wirkende Luftströmung erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 1/08; A46D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1262121 A2 20021204; EP 1262121 A3 20050420; EP 1262121 B1 20070124; DE 10126631 A1 20021205; DE 50209325 D1 20070315; US 2002180253 A1 20021205; US 6854811 B2 20050215

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50209325

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120507

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110507

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110507

2011-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: M + C SCHIFFER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: M + C SCHIFFER GMBH

- Free text: M + C SCHIFFER GMBH#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 4#53577 NEUSTADT-WIED (DE) -TRANSFER TO- M + C SCHIFFER GMBH#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 4#53577 NEUSTADT-WIED (DE)

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071025

2007-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209325 P 20070315

2007-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2007-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-01-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-11-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 46D 1/08 A

2005-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 46D 3/04 B

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI